Trustees THE NEW LONDON SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 1133578
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Levin | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Kosmin | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Futerman | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Norton | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Baron | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Lennard | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ottolengjhi | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hirsch | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Carlebach | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Linden | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.