Trustees THE PARK THEATRE
Charity number: 1137223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Clare | Chair | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Heycock | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Smith | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ibukunoluwa Alamutu | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edwards | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Clarke | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hedda Rachel Beeby | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kurt Barling | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rufus Olins | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
BHARAT MEHTA | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA MARY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.