Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. FRANCIS, PETTS WOOD
Charity number: 1127654
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Alex Niechcial | Chair | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Andrew Wakerley | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neeley Taylor | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bami Jenner Cole | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander David Graham | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosina Parrington | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Thomas | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GERALD INCE | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
IRENE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN CLARA BURLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY EDWARD BURLACE C.ENG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.