Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. EUSTACHIUS, TAVISTOCK
Charity number: 1130516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Hibbert | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Julia Rita Hurle | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Boulter | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ann Roderick Hake | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Townsend | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JEAN HUNTER | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Traber | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Herbert | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roma Keogh | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Sherlock | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Fenton Godfrey | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Erle John Pendle | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Irene Joy Loader | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Isabel Barrow | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Routledge | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bastin | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Rose Illingworth | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hazel Judith Butland | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Stoate | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rowan | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judith Blowey | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA JANE HEATHMAN | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDWIN TEAGUE | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.