Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS & ALL SAINT'S WORCESTER
Charity number: 1128121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR RICH JOHNSON | Chair | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Rogerson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Langmead | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Lucas | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jess Fellows | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Coleman | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Bannister | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Chase | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Croft | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Prigg | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bristow | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Fraser Oates | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jackman | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Lucas | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.