Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL HALLOWS BY THE TOWER WITH ST. DUNSTAN'S IN THE EAST, LONDON
Charity number: 1129137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katherine Jane Hedderly | Chair | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hasmeeta Mahandru | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Lomas MBE FRSA | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Risley | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Eileen Midgley-Adam | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stephen Charles Stichbury | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Siobhan Martin PhD | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Caroline Annabel Acland | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
DIANA MARY ROBERTSHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH LESLIE MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.