Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, OXFORD
Charity number: 1129280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dan Heyward | Chair | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Catherine Rachel Sinfield | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ruth Guest | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nellie Yen Loh | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Coates | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Susan Valerie Fuggle | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Christine Holmes Taylor | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Eyre | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Edward Booth | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Henry John Leigh Swayne | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Santhanadass | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILLIAM DOWN | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Saunders | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Judith Madigan Harvey | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Catherine Ekins | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Olver | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Ruth Gooding | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Cooper | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas Christopher Murray | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas William Howell | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bishop | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lewis | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Darrel Grant Ross | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Elizabeth Jane Pitkethly | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Anderton Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev PAUL MATTHEW WHITE | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.