Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, CHORLEYWOOD
Charity number: 1130419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tim Horlock | Chair | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Llewelyn Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Anne Celia Carol Baron | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bridget Lee Martin | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Martin | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev James Ashley Osborn Rigby | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael Geoffrey Thompson | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tanitha Wait | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Corinne Williamson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philip Barton | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jonathan Logan | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bill Harer | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Benjamin John | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
NIGEL CHALLIS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jackie Gedling | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Adeola Oludemi | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
John Ford | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
LES PALMER | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
CATHERINE HARER | Trustee | 06 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
William Trevor Seddon | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
JUDITH PALFREMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.