Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAVANT
Charity number: 1131684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martha Grace Weatherill | Chair | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian Kingsford | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA BLADES | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Colin Campbell | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Tostevin | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Quest | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Bill | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Loten | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deecie Tester | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY SIMS | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.