Trustees GLAMORGAN HERITAGE COAST MINISTRY AREA
Charity number: 1131490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sian Tesni Copeland Roberts | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Lancaster | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Emma Elizabeth Street | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Newton | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Julian Simpson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Elizabeth Evans | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mary Evans | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA MARGARET MUMFORD | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GEOFFREY SEMMENS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Craig Aaron Vaughan | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Canon Edwin Charles Robert Counsell | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARIE JANE SHEPPARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFFREY LESLIE ROBINSON B.A., M.ED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.