Trustees The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Up Holland and Dalton
Charity number: 1131230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Lock | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Vivienne Mitchell | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dobson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Lees | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Bryan | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Cooke | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wilkie | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Baker | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Wilcox | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Foxcroft | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Webster | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Wankling | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jen Williams | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eve Barr | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Samples | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Girvin | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alaric Hicks | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Trainor | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Garner | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Entwistle | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Roughley | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Dunbar | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Holmes | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Givens | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Woods | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Starkey | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Gardner | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.