Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEACONSFIELD
Charity number: 1132259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daphne Scott | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Annie Bennett | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Harriet Baldwin | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Davidson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Davidson | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Godrich | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Portwood | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Margot Mardelle Suter | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Rinehart Bischoff | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sharon Roberts | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Michael Johnson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM EDWARDS | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Trevor Sharkey | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Fiona Collins | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW DAVID FARNCOMBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Hazel May Chow | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Edward Weiss FCA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.