Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, SPROTBROUGH WITH ST EDMUND, ANCHORAGE LANE
Charity number: 1133069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Ann Palmer | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Herbert Mrs | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Paskell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Towers | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Christine Hudson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Therese Martine Paskell | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Inglis | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marlyn Ann Hopson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Susan Offord | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Scott | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Roy Barraclough | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Heaton | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Barraclough | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MISS BETTY BROCKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.