Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA
Charity number: 1136147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Holland | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Kathleen Carpenter | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Parry | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Lamont Brown | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lizzy Cross | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Darling | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Moore | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Freda Files | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Purkiss | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Cornelius | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Belinda May Knowler | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ALAN MCINTYRE | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.