Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DURRINGTON DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER
Charity number: 1134809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Winter | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thorpe | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David McPherson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Christine Brett | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Noble-Danischevsky | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Nancy Brockhurst | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS VIVIAN MCPHERSON | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Brett | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE AUSTIN | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULE MARY HARPER | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN MCCALLUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jane Winter | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.