Trustees BOSTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1135515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Trevor Hewitt | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Darley | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Criddle | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Margaret Criddle | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Haresign | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Valerie Jean Ogden | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Barnden | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN COCK | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LYNN THORN | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Julie Doddrell | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR MICHAEL JESSOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR STUART BIRKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY MALCOLM CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY ELIZABETH FORINTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey Sharp | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER JESSOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY MAUD BURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN JENNIFER DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA LYMER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.