Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY & ST MICHAEL'S, EGREMONT
Charity number: 1136966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Ann Gibbs | Chair | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Frank Gates | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lionel Simpson BSc CertEd | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie June Coleman Dip. Ed. | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Reay CertEd, BA | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mawson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Gates | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Holdsworth | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Jane Holland | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Postlethwaite | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Holland | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DORIS DOWNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.