Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST MARY, STROOD
Charity number: 1138948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Max Ernest Keith Russell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Uberta Casely-Hayford | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lanza Effuah Wilson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Vince BAHons | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olusoga Odumosu | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Fiona Vallente-Kerr | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Abigail Goodwin | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Wilkinson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LESLIE FOXWELL | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARRABLE B Ed | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR JEFF WHITELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DAVID WILLIAM GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE LESLEY FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.