Trustees UNIVERSITY OF LEICESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1137811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Bates | Chair | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Hyett | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prachi Bhatt | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Thomas | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Alicia Black | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Phillip Ruddock | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hoor Pathan | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack William McDonald | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Archie William Robinson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Moore | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.