Governing document BRISTOL CONCERT WIND BAND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 04 AUG 2010 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 04/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 2016 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 2.1 TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS 2.2 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.