Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD UNION
Charity number: 1148622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamza Pervez Khan | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazmin Ahamed Mohammed Tharicque | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Umar Taj | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwaseun Onikan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwarotimi Olorunfemi | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamaradiseere Agama | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Ali | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iqra Tabassum | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwendolen Bradshaw | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Cameron Russell-Moyle | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.