Trustees UWE STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1143067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fayaz Abdul Kareem | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krishna Singh | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabiha Khan | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olure Kolawole Samuel | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bolt | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aengus Miralto-Desmond | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethel Ekaette | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Balmer | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Redwood | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.