Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, HYTHE
Charity number: 1144695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David William Darkins | Chair | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
BRIAN JOHN BISHOP | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JANE MATTOCKS | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HUGH TAYLOR | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lionel Godwin Owen | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
BRINLEY HUGHES | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
HELEN FLORENCE WAYMOUTH | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH TYLER | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John Charles Wren | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|||||
MARILYN HAZEL ANNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERKELEY HILL | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY COX | Trustee | 10 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.