Trustees SUFFOLK WEST CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1144118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Anne Nicholls | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Knight | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Finn | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Mayer | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wilkie | Trustee | 09 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Raymond David Bolton | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marc Walker | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Porch | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Holland | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.