Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE
Charity number: 1146162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gail Jewell Gretel Davey | Chair | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Harrison | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Margaret Gyapong | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Olaoluwa Pheabian Akinwale | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Said Addallah Jongo MD MMed | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Buddha Basnyat | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Varghese | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pramod Chandra Samantaray | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olufemi Adewole Adewole | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yusuff Adegboyega Yusuff FRSPH MPH | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bridget Wills | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hazell | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Mabey CBE | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr james whitworth | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
sarah rafferty | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Renny Bush | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.