Trustees BREATHING SPACE
Charity number: 1148676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOEL DIXON | Chair | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elaine Boggon | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Peers | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Bethan Catherine Noel Lacey | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denis Daggett | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bob Dean | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
David John Wilcox | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.