Trustees THE HACKNEY FOODBANK
Charity number: 1149896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Bethel | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kamila Dagny Przybyszewska-Demuren | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anderson | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Pile | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
dr Katharine Sarah Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK BOISSON | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Obrien | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Vaughan Johnson | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.