Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SPROWSTON WITH BEESTON ST ANDREW
Charity number: 1149140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Graveling | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Sally Dallas | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lesley Jackson S.R.N. | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Robinson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Susan Rennie | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek James Robinson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Cole | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Coe | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELLINGHAM | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA KERRISON WINTER | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Timothy Carpenter | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Susan Carpenter | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA PHYLLIS TUFFIELD | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV DEAN AKRILL BA | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE MARY GRAND | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FRANCIS HUNTLY | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP HUDSON | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.