Trustees ONCA TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1150539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jane Zajicek Coleman | Chair | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Paccha Turner Chuji | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Uchendu | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vinita Damodaran | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Whistler | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Donna Marie Westbury | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Eva Maria Zajicek Coleman | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.