Trustees BLUE APPLE THEATRE
Charity number: 1151078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Paul Gifford | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Louise Taylor | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Tomlinson | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Louise Ball | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne McKenna | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Stevens Weston | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kim Alexander Gottlieb | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Edward James Rochead | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Stuart Rutter | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.