Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH MORETON
Charity number: 1152051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ronald Iveson | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mary Anders | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Yvonne Stocker | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Stott | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Hindle | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Culligan | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Smith | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Holmes | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JONES | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
CLAIR LIANNE CULLIGAN | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN CLAIRE HUGHES | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Fisher | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ELIZABETH ALLEN | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DAVID JONES | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Ann Lawrence | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Alison Matthews | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Debbi Stott | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.