Trustees RED ROSE RECOVERY LANCASHIRE
Charity number: 1152474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Frederick Joseph Woodcock | Chair | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katherine Walsh | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Head | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Brown | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Richmond | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Webster | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Clare Ellison | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL SMITH | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.