Trustees ATHERTON & LEIGH FOODBANK
Charity number: 1153333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REGINALD WILLIAM SINCLAIR | Chair | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Walker Blinkhorn | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Eric Firth | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE DEVONPORT | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Phelan | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT MATTHIAS | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alex Drabble | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Karena Crompton | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|||||
IAN JAMES GARDINER | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.