Trustees WORKSOP AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1156668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Hancocks | Chair | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Parkin | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wass | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Claire Culpan | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fillingham | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Short | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fillingham | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Massey | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.