Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR MIDDLE EASTERN STUDIES
Charity number: 1161206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Miriyam Aouragh | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hanaa Almoaibed | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Farooq | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sabiha Allouche | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hana Sleiman | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Chamas | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wassim Naboulsi | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jose Ciro Martinez | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Sarah Garbett | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Feras Alkabani | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lewis Edward Turner | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marianna Charountaki | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharri Plonski | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paola Teresa Carla Rivetti | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Neve Gordon | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LLOYD RIDGEON PhD | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.