Accounts and annual returns FASHION FOR RELIEF
Charity number: 1159995
Regulatory alert
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
24 May 2023 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 233 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2020 | On time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 08 April 2019 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 08 April 2019 | 62 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window