HiVitality
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HiVitality runs residential retreats for people from across the UK who have been diagnosed HIV positive. We offer peer support, facilitated discussion groups and complementary therapies, amongst other social activities .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2015: CIO registration
- 17 June 2017: Funds received from 1040586 NATIONAL LONG TERM SURVIVORS GROUP (HIV)
- NLTSG (Working name)
- NATIONAL LONG TERM SURVIVORS GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher McFarlane Baxter | Chair | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Binns | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paul Bazeley | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Kay Lenora Willis | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tremaine Cornish | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.29k | £19.61k | £10.46k | £33.75k | £32.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.18k | £17.46k | £791 | £28.45k | £38.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Feb 2015 as amended on 18 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR FINANCIAL DISTRESS OR HARDSHIP CAUSED BY HIV, OR HIV-RELATED CONDITIONS, AMONGST THOSE AFFECTED BY SUCH CONDITION AND IN PARTICULAR, ALTHOUGH NOT TO LIMIT THE FOREGOING, AMONGST THOSE LIVING WITH A POSITIVE HIV DIAGNOSIS FOR FIVE YEARS OR MORE IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL MATTERS WHICH ARE RELATED TO, OR BELIEVED TO BE RELATED TO, LIVING WITH A POSITIVE HIV DIAGNOSIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 03001021628
- Email:
- mail@hivitality.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window