Trustees HARBOROUGH TOWN COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1163188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE CHRISTOPHER JONES | Chair | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adam Cookson | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Pepler | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dougan | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Scott Dougan | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KEITH WINSTON | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIOBHAN JUSTINE BREWIN | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.