Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEWCHAPEL
Charity number: 1163088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV SISTER JANET ARNOLD | Chair | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Timbey | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nicholson | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Adams | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HARPER | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
lESLEY STOKER | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NANCY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GORDON PRITCHARD | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONNA RAMPLING | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY IRENE ELDEN | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ELDEN | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.