Trustees NATIONAL DRAMA
Charity number: 1173215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Alan Readman PhD,FRSA | Chair | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yuk-Lan Chan PhD | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha O'Reilly | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mears | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Alec Rainer BA, MA | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Wallace-Jones | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mai Newberry | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Coyne PhD | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lawrence | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Zeena Rasheed | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|||||
VIVIENNE LAFFERTY DIPED | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.