Trustees ZENITH YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1169585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Palmer | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny McKim | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT ROGERS | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia McSherry | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Tucker | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joel White | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roy Page | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Delia Lee | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Carol Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.