Trustees BISHOP SUTTON PRE-SCHOOL AND FOREST CLUB
Charity number: 1172849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Yeo-Smith | Chair | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Wise | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Short | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Tofts | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jocelyn Harriet Dunn-Nail | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Daley | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jayne Patterson | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Bird | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Amy Curreel Hobbs | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA OAKLEY | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.