Accounts and annual returns THE ASPIRE ACADEMY & TUITION
Charity number: 1175485
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 85 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 85 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 April 2023 | 436 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 12 August 2020 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window