Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR GEOMORPHOLOGY
Charity number: 1179467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fiona Hilary Thompson Caithness | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Roy Hackney | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart William David Grieve | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harry Edward James Sanders | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annie Ockelford | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Westoby | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Dingle | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hywel Griffiths | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Callard | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Heather Ann Viles | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.