Governing document HAWKWELL VILLAGE U3A
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APR 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 25 Jun 2020 as amended on 30 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HAWKWELL VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.