Trustees HAWKWELL VILLAGE U3A
Charity number: 1178118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Laird | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Catton | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ashpole | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Adams | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Ford | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Pickard | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sutton | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Johnson | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Broad | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Coral Kathro | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Silverman | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.