Trustees CHRIST CHURCH PADGATE PCC
Charity number: 1178871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NEIL GRAHAM SHAW | Chair | 08 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH WATERFIELD | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Barrie Crabtree | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Brown | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA LAWRENCE | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bryers | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cath Baguley | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Blaydon | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Baguley | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JILL PERFECT | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA JACQUES | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Helen Elizabeth Appleby | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KEMP | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNIFER ROBINSON | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL RODNEY PERFECT | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ALAN MARKHAM CLAYTON | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.