Trustees FALMOUTH AND PENRYN WELCOME REFUGEE FAMILIES
Charity number: 1181196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIET SARA MUNDEN | Chair | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lay | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bond | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Topf | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sylvia Coles | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Lee Wright | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Johnson | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Cox | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.