Trustees Holyport Community Trust
Charity number: 1179097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Coppinger | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Slattery | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Campbell | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Efimia Marina Marinos | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hudson | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Wilson | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Karen Jane Kelly | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN COPPINGER | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE DYDE | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marysia Stone | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.