Governing document THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/1981 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1981 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, PARTIALLY-SIGHTED OR THOSE WHO HAVE DIFFICULTY READING BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION, ON A REGULAR BASIS, OF AN AUDIO RECORDING OF NEWS FROM IN AND AROUND PERSHORE (AND WHERE NECESSARY PROVIDE THE MEANS OF PLAYING THE RECORDING).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.